EP1155537 - NETWORK ROUTER SEARCH ENGINE USING COMPRESSED TREE FORWARDING TABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2017/20] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1194 North Mathilda Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states Redstone Communications, Inc. One Executive Drive Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIPMAN, Michael, E. 129 W. Bare Hill Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
HEYDA, Russell, L. 16 Sanderson Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/44] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Thévenet, Jean-Bruno, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 00915846.0 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000US04593 | Priority number, date | US19990259064 | 26.02.1999 Original published format: US 259064 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051298 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155537 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155537 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/741 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
H04L45/742 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2018/40] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | NETZROUTER-SUCHMACHINE MIT KOMPRIMIERTERBAUMARTIGER ROUTING-TABELLEN | [2001/47] | English: | NETWORK ROUTER SEARCH ENGINE USING COMPRESSED TREE FORWARDING TABLE | [2001/47] | French: | APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE D'ACHEMINEMENT DE RÉSEAU UTILISANT UNE TABLE D'ACHEMINEMENT ARBORESCENTE COMPRIMÉE | [2018/17] |
Former [2001/47] | APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE D'ACHEMINEMENT DE RESEAU UTILISANT UNE TABLE D'ACHEMINEMENT ARBORESCENTE COMPRIMEE | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 23.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | DK | 03.10.2018 | ES | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | GR | 04.01.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | IE | 23.02.2019 | LU | 23.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2021/26] |
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 23.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 23.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
DK | 03.10.2018 | ||
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
ES | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0556148 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * column 20, line 28 - column 21, line 44 ** figure 10 *; | [X]WO9518497 (NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * claim - * * figures 8-12 *; | [DX] - DEGERMARK M ET AL, "Small forwarding tables for fast routing lookups", SIGCOMM SYMPOSIUM COMMUNICATIONS ARCHITECTURES & PROTOCOLS, ACM PRESS, US, (19970914), vol. 27, no. 4, pages 3 - 14, XP002266698 [DX] 1-9,11,12,14 * section 4 * | International search | [A]US5412654 (PERKINS CHARLES E [US]); | [A]US5842224 (FENNER PETER R [US]); | [AP]US5946679 (AHUJA RITESH [US], et al); | [AP]US6011795 (VARGHESE GEORGE [US], et al); | [AE]US6061712 (TZENG HONG-YI [US]) | by applicant | EP0556148 |