EP1194422 - BIARYL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER 5323 Harry Hines Boulevard Dallas, TX 75235-9094 / US | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNGQUIST, Robert, Scott 8511 Charleston Knoll Court Mason, OH 45040 / US | 02 /
MCIVER, John, McMillan 9999 Indian Springs Drive Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00915935.1 | 01.03.2000 | [2002/15] | WO2000US05194 | Priority number, date | US19990137052P | 01.06.1999 Original published format: US 137052 P | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0073292 | Date: | 07.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194422 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/08, C07C233/25, C07C233/29, A61K31/165, A61P17/14, A61K31/535, A61K31/40 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
A61K8/411 (EP);
A61K8/49 (EP);
A61K8/4913 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61Q7/00 (EP);
C07C215/74 (EP);
C07C217/82 (EP);
C07C233/25 (EP);
C07C233/33 (EP);
C07C233/76 (EP);
C07D295/096 (EP);
C07D295/112 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BIARYLVERBINDUNGEN | [2002/15] | English: | BIARYL COMPOUNDS | [2002/15] | French: | COMPOSES BIARYLES | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/32] | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0580550 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9625943 (LIFE MEDICAL SCIENCES INC [US]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB2138286 (MORTIMER DR CHRISTOPHER HARRY) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5284971 (WALKER KEITH A [US], et al) [DY] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XY]US5061798 (EMMETT JOHN COLIN [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-9 * see especially definitions of Ar * [Y] 1-10 | [A] - N YOKOYAMA, "Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of oxamic acid and acetic acid derivatives related to L-thyronine", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, (19950101), vol. 38, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 695 - 707, XP002080908 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00004a015 |