EP1212635 - METHOD AND APPARATUS COMBINING A TRACKING SYSTEM AND A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RF Technologies, Inc. 3125 N. 125th Street Brookfield, Wisconsin 53005 / US | [2002/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDINGER, James 6 Traymore Street Cambridge, Massachussetts 02140 / US | 02 /
LANZL, Colin 83 Nottingham Drive Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 03 /
WERB, Jay 44 Lombard Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/24] | 01 /
GOLDINGER, James 8 Gloucester Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | ||
02 /
LANZL, Colin 83 Nottingham Drive Nashua, NH 03062 / US | |||
03 /
WERB, Jay 44 Lombard Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916010.2 | 02.03.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000US05493 | Priority number, date | US19990122720P | 03.03.1999 Original published format: US 122720 P | US19990378417 | 20.08.1999 Original published format: US 378417 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052498 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212635 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/76, G06K19/07 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
G01S13/878 (EP);
G01S13/825 (EP);
G06K7/0008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG, DIE EIN VERFOLGUNGSSYSTEM UND EIN DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM KOMBINIEREN | [2002/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS COMBINING A TRACKING SYSTEM AND A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2002/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL COMBINANT UN SYSTEME DE RECHERCHE ET UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/19] | 11.05.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.12.2001 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002 | 13.12.2001 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002 | 13.12.2001 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.12.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   14.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5774876 (WOOLLEY LOUIS A [US], et al) [X] 1-16,21-36 * column 1, line 39 - column 3, line 36 * * column 16, line 9 - column 26, line 61; figures 1-4,12,15 *; | [X]US5119104 (HELLER ALAN C [US]) [X] 17-20,37-40 * column 5, line 12 - column 5, line 59 * * column 14, line 14 - column 14, line 63; figures 1,4 *; | [X]WO9749972 (PAR GOVERNMENT SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 1-16,21-36 * page 31, line 29 - page 35, line 15; figures 1-4,12,15 * * page 37, line 18 - page 46, line 3 *; | [X]US5420883 (SWENSEN MARVIN D [US], et al) [X] 17-20,37-40 * column 4, line 51 - column 6, line 68; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]EP0851239 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 17-20,37-40 * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0779520 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1,17,21,37 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 47; figure 1 * |