EP1159677 - UPDATING READ-ONLY SOFTWARE MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GINSBERG, Michael 26125 NE 27th Drive Redmond, WA 98053 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916052.4 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US05641 | Priority number, date | US19990261686 | 03.03.1999 Original published format: US 261686 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0052573 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1159677 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159677 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G06F8/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNG VON 'NUR ZU LESEN' SOFTWAREMODULEN | [2001/49] | English: | UPDATING READ-ONLY SOFTWARE MODULES | [2001/49] | French: | MISE A JOUR DE MODULES LOGICIELS EN MEMOIRE MORTE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 08.01.2003 | AT | 03.03.2003 | CY | 03.03.2003 | FI | 03.03.2003 | IE | 03.03.2003 | LU | 03.03.2003 | PT | 03.03.2003 | ES | 04.03.2003 | SE | 04.03.2003 | BE | 31.03.2003 | MC | 31.03.2003 | DK | 30.04.2003 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/23] | GR | 08.01.2003 | |
AT | 03.03.2003 | ||
CY | 03.03.2003 | ||
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.03.2003 | ||
LU | 03.03.2003 | ||
ES | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2007/04] | AT | 03.03.2003 | |
CY | 03.03.2003 | ||
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
IE | 03.03.2003 | ||
LU | 03.03.2003 | ||
ES | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 03.03.2003 | |
CY | 03.03.2003 | ||
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
LU | 03.03.2003 | ||
ES | 04.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
MC | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 03.03.2003 | |
CY | 03.03.2003 | ||
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
LU | 03.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 03.03.2003 | |
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
LU | 03.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 03.03.2003 | |
FI | 03.03.2003 | ||
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 03.03.2003 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
DK | 30.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | FI | 03.03.2003 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 03.03.2003 | |
SE | 04.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 03.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5581768 (GARNEY JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 3,13,20,24 * abstract * * column 6, line 32 - line 55 *; | [XY]EP0810522 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-12,14-19,21-23,25-28 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 28; figures 3,12 * [Y] 3,13,20,24; | [A]US5764987 (EIDT ERIK L [US], et al) [A] 8* abstract * |