EP1159179 - CAM ACTIVATED HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED DEFENSE, L.P. Suite 700, 1525 Wilson Boulevard Arlington Virginia 22209 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states UNITED DEFENSE, L.P. Suite 700, 1525 Wilson Boulevard Arlington Virginia 22209 / US | ||
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states UNITED DEFENSE, L.P. Suite 700, 1525 Wilson Boulevard Arlington, Virginia 22209 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTZ, Timothy, James 2349 Fiddlers Elbow Road Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US | 02 /
HUBICZ, Thomas, E. 381 E. Maple Street Dallastown, PA 17313 / US | 03 /
FAY, William, A., III 12 McClellan Drive East Berlin, PA 17316 / US | 04 /
TAMBURRINO, Dan, A. 610 Florida Avenue York, PA 17313 / US | 05 /
EDWARDS, Dana, R. 2676 W. College Avenue York, PA 17313 / US | 06 /
BROWN, William, J. 72 Shorbs Hill Road Hanover, PA 17331 / US | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/49] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler . Isenbruck Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916063.1 | 06.03.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000US05675 | Priority number, date | US19990267915 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: US 267915 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0051865 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159179 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159179 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/10, B60T13/58, B60T7/04 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B60T13/588 (EP,US);
B60T11/102 (EP,US);
B60T7/04 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1896 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NOCKENGETRIEBENE, HYDRAULISCHE BREMSANLAGE | [2001/49] | English: | CAM ACTIVATED HYDRAULIC BRAKING SYSTEM | [2001/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE FREINAGE A CAME A COMMANDE HYDRAULIQUE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.12.2005 | IE | 06.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 15.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/12] | IE | 06.03.2006 | |
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | LU | 31.03.2006 | |
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | MC | 31.03.2006 | |
PT | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | MC | 31.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3106268 (CHRISTENSON HOWARD W, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4088209 (DRONE GARY ALAN); | [A]GB1592824 (KUBOTA LTD) [A] 1,7 * page 2, line 80 - page 3, line 76; figures 1-3 * |