EP1177228 - Process for making solvent-free copolymers of maleic anhydride and alkyl vinyl ethers having a specific viscosity of 0.5 to 5 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/06] | SOLVENT-FREE COPOLYMERS OF MALEIC ANHYDRIDE AND ALKYL VINYL ETHERS HAVING A SPECIFIC VISCOSITY OF 0.5 TO 5 | ||
[2005/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [2006/06] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states ISP INVESTMENTS INC. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLOCHOCKA, Krystyna 2305 Mountain Avenue Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00916074.8 | 02.03.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000US05689 | Priority number, date | US19990268834 | 16.03.1999 Original published format: US 268834 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055221 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1177228 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177228 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/04, C08F2/42, C08F210/02 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/347 (EP,US);
A61K8/8164 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
C08F222/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/0008 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0008, C08L35/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/06] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von lösungsmittelfreien Copolymere aus Maleinsäureanhydrid und Alkylvinylethern mit spezifischer Viscosität von 0.5 bis 5 | [2005/35] | English: | Process for making solvent-free copolymers of maleic anhydride and alkyl vinyl ethers having a specific viscosity of 0.5 to 5 | [2005/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de copolymères exempts de solvant à base d'anhydride maléique et d'éthers vinyliques dont la viscosité oscille entre 0.5 et 5 | [2005/35] |
Former [2002/06] | LÖSUNGSMITTELFREIE COPOLYMERE AUS MALEINSÄUREANHYDRID UND ALKYLVINYLETHERN MIT SPEZIFISCHER VISKOSITÄT VON 0.5 BIS 5 | ||
Former [2002/06] | SOLVENT-FREE COPOLYMERS OF MALEIC ANHYDRIDE AND ALKYL VINYL ETHERS HAVING A SPECIFIC VISCOSITY OF 0.5 TO 5 | ||
Former [2002/06] | COPOLYMERES EXEMPTS DE SOLVANT D'ANHYDRE MALEIQUE ET D'ETHERS VINYLIQUES D'ALKYLE DONT LA VISCOSITE SPECIFIQUE OSCILLE ENTRE 0,5 ET 5 | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | BE | 08.02.2006 | CH | 08.02.2006 | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | LI | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | IE | 02.03.2006 | LU | 02.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | ES | 19.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
LU | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 02.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
ES | 19.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 19.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3868432 (KEEGAN JAMES J, et al); | [Y]US4435536 (KATO YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US4721761 (OMAE TADAYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]US4962185 (TAZI MOHAMMED [US], et al); | [A]US5166271 (MASUKO SEIICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5214089 (LOGIN ROBERT B [US], et al) |