Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1169093
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
02.03.2007 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
30.11.2006 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.05.2006 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.05.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
23.11.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
23.11.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
19.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|