Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055543 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0055281 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0054844 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004500443 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US52657800 | 16.03.2000 | US0007024 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539290 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007022 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002539289 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US0007025 | 17.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1194499 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657800 | 16.03.2000 | US0007024 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1163475 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007022 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4012700 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007022 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3892400 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0007024 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3754700 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US0007025 | 17.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3382600 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0005033 | 25.02.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1169093 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US0007025 | 17.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365530 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657800 | 16.03.2000 | US0007024 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2365871 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0007022 | 17.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2367369 | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US0007025 | 17.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1344308 | 10.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US52657800 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1344361 | 10.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | US52221000 | 09.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6669104 | 30.12.2003 | B2 | US2002153428 | 24.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US13314102 | 26.04.2002 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6199768 | 13.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0054845 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1344173 | 10.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US52657700 | 16.03.2000 | US52657600 | 16.03.2000 | US27181399 | 18.03.1999 |