EP1169093 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ATOMIZING FCC FEED OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 180 Park Avenue P.O. Box 390 Florham Park NJ 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company PO Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVEAL, Russell, John, Jr. 4723 Beech Harbor Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | 02 /
ITO, Jackson, I. 2507 Occidental Drive Sacramento, CA 95826 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 00916441.9 | 17.03.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000US07025 | Priority number, date | US19990271813 | 18.03.1999 Original published format: US 271813 | US20000526577 | 16.03.2000 Original published format: US 526577 | US20000526576 | 16.03.2000 Original published format: US 526576 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0054845 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169093 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62C5/02, F23D14/68 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C10G11/18 (EP);
A62C31/12 (EP);
B01J19/26 (EP);
B01J8/1827 (EP);
F23D11/007 (EP);
B01J2208/00327 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZERSTÄUBUNG VON FCC-ÖL (FLUIDKATALYTISCHEM KRACKÖL) | [2002/02] | English: | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ATOMIZING FCC FEED OIL | [2002/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ATOMISER UNE HUILE D'ALIMENTATION DE CRAQUAGE CATALYTIQUE FLUIDE | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2001 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/14] | 07.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2358386 ; | [X]US3606154 |