EP1191975 - IMPROVEMENT OF T CELL MEDIATED IMMUNITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norwood Immunology, Ltd. 63, Wells Road, Chelsea Heights Victoria 3196 / AU | [2008/23] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states MONASH UNIVERSITY Wellington Road Clayton, VIC 3168 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYD, Richard, Lennox 60 Linacre Road Hampton, Victoria 3188 / AU | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/24] | Harding, Charles Thomas, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00916705.7 | 17.04.2000 | [2002/14] | WO2000AU00329 | Priority number, date | AU1999PP09778 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: AU PP977899 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0062657 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191975 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61P37/06, A61P37/04, A61P5/02, A61P5/24, A61K38/09 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/09 (EP);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K39/39 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER T-ZELLIMMUNITÄT | [2002/14] | English: | IMPROVEMENT OF T CELL MEDIATED IMMUNITY | [2002/14] | French: | AMELIORATION DE L'IMMUNITE INDUITE PAR LES LYMPHOCYTES T | [2002/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 05.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 06.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.01.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8801176 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]) [A] 17* the whole document *; | [A]WO9219746 (CSL LTD [AU]) [A] 17 * the whole document *; | [X] - PLOSKER G L ET AL, "Leuprorelin. A review of its pharmacology and therapeutic use in prostatic cancer, endometriosis and other sex hormone-related disorders.", DRUGS. DEC 1994, (199412), vol. 48, no. 6, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 930 - 967, XP001202673 [X] 1-3,5,13,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-199448060-00008 | [A] - LANDSTRÖM M ET AL, "Apoptosis in rat prostatic adenocarcinoma is associated with rapid infiltration of cytotoxic T-cells and activated macrophages.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER. JOURNAL INTERNATIONAL DU CANCER. 2 MAY 1997, (19970502), vol. 71, no. 3, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 451 - 455, XP002322556 [A] 1-17 * page 451, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 454, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19970502)71:3<451::AID-IJC24>3.0.CO;2-H | International search | [X]WO8801176 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [X]WO9219746 (CSL LTD [AU]); | [X]AU7617791 (CSL LTD) | [X] - JANSSON LISELOTTE, OLSSON THOMAS AND HOLMDAHL RIKARD, "Estrogen induces a potent suppression of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis and collagen-induced arthritis in mice", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 53, pages 203 - 207 | [X] - LANDSTROM MARENE AND FUNA KEIKO, "Apoptosis in rat prostatic adenocarcinoma is associated with rapid infiltration of cytotoxic T-cells and activated macrophages", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (1997), vol. 71, pages 451 - 455 | [X] - LEPASAVIC GORDANA, KARAPETROVIC BRANKA, MICIC MILEVA AND KOSEC DUSKO, "Prepubertal castration alters the phenotypic profile of adult rat", THYMOCYTES NEUROIMMUNOMODULATION, (1995), vol. 2, pages 100 - 107 | [X] - ABOUDKHIL S., BUREAU J.P., GARIELLY L. AND VAGO P., "Effects of castration, depo-testosterone and cyproterone acetate on lymphocyte T subsets in mouse thymus and spleen", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 34, pages 647 - 653 | [X] - PLOSKER G.L. AND BROGDEN R.N., "Leuprorelin. A review on its pharmacology and therapeutic use in prostatic cancer, endometriosis and other sex hormone related disorders", DRUGS, (1994), vol. 48, page 930 |