EP1088384 - METHOD FOR FITTING A WORM TO AN ARMATURE SHAFT OF AN ARMATURE OF AN ELECTROMOTOR AND ARMATURE PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUTH, Lothar Konrad-Adenauer-Strasse 11 D-77815 Bühl / DE | [2001/14] | Application number, filing date | 00916797.4 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/14] | WO2000DE00685 | Priority number, date | DE1999116998 | 15.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19916998 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0064032 | Date: | 26.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088384 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088384 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/116, H02K15/00, F16H55/22 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
H02K15/00 (EP,US);
H02K7/116 (KR);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49012 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49467 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49469 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49476 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/26] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG EINER SCHNECKE AN EINER ANKERWELLE EINES ANKERS EINES ELEKTROMOTORS UND MIT DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER ANKER | [2001/14] | English: | METHOD FOR FITTING A WORM TO AN ARMATURE SHAFT OF AN ARMATURE OF AN ELECTROMOTOR AND ARMATURE PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD | [2001/14] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ATTACHER UNE VIS SANS FIN SUR UN ARBRE D'INDUIT D'UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE ET INDUIT PRODUIT SELON CE PROCEDE | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 07.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 25.09.2003 | [2004/10] | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3866486 (LECHNER WALTER L) [X] 5,7 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 10; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6; | [XA]FR2565043 (MECANISMES COMP IND DE [FR]) [X] 5 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, column 10; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6,7; | [XA]US5056213 (BEHNKE EDWARD [US], et al) [X] 5,7 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 6; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6; | [XA]DE4125491 (SWF AUTO ELECTRIC GMBH [DE]) [X] 5,7 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 * [A] 1-4,6; | [A]EP0712197 (JOHNSON ELECTRIC SA [CH]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9810971 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |