EP1163303 - UTILIZATION OF TRICYCLODECANDIMETHANOL FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER LACQUERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGART, Hubert Am Dornbusch 44 a D-48163 Münster / DE | 02 /
RINK, Heinz-Peter Lohöfener Weg 44 D-48153 Münster / DE | 03 /
RÖCKRATH, Ulrike Vikarsbusch 8 D-48308 Senden / DE | 04 /
FARWICK, Thomas Sandbreide 9 a D-48727 Billerbeck / DE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Fitzner, Uwe, et al Fitzner & Frese PartGmbB Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Fitzner, Uwe, et al Dres. Fitzner & Münch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
Former [2001/51] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00916854.3 | 21.02.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000EP01412 | Priority number, date | DE1999107978 | 25.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907978 | DE2000104750 | 03.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004750 | [2001/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0050523 | Date: | 31.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163303 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1163303 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/12, B05D7/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
B05D7/53 (EP,US);
B05D7/57 (EP,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,US);
C08K5/05 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2004/25] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DIE VERWENDUNG VON TRICYCLODECANDIMETHANOL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEHRSCHICHTLACKIERUNGEN | [2001/51] | English: | UTILIZATION OF TRICYCLODECANDIMETHANOL FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER LACQUERS | [2001/51] | French: | UTILISATION DE TRICYCLODECANE DIMETHANOL POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PEINTURES MULTICOUCHES | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0436364 ; | [A]DE2200022 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [A] 4 * page 3 *; | [A]EP0785034 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11* page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 12, Database accession no. 1992-093039, XP002141305 & JPH0436364 A 19920206 (TOYOBO KK) [A] 4 * abstract * |