EP1157018 - A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TAXANES FROM 10-DEACETYLBACCATIN III [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2006 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.04.2006 | Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDENA S.p.A. Viale Ortles, 12 20139 Milano / IT | [2001/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOMBARDELLI, Ezio Via Val di Sole, 22 I-20141 Milano / IT | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | Minoja, Fabrizio, Dr. Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00916860.0 | 23.02.2000 | [2001/48] | WO2000EP01471 | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00417 | 02.03.1999 Original published format: IT MI990417 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052003 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1157018 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1157018 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/14, A61K31/335, C07D413/12 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D305/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D263/14 (KR);
C07D263/16 (KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 08.08.2001 | SI | 08.08.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZU HERSTELLUNG VON TAXANEN AUS 10-DESACETYLBACCATIN III | [2001/48] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF TAXANES FROM 10-DEACETYLBACCATIN III | [2001/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE TAXANES A PARTIR DE 10-DESACETYLBACCATINE III | [2001/48] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 26.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.02.2003 | LU | 23.02.2003 | MC | 28.02.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | CY | 23.02.2003 | |
LU | 23.02.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | LU | 23.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9209589 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [A] 1,2* the whole document * |