EP1164870 - Cereal bar with high milk solids content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/01] | CEREAL BAR | ||
[2003/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURRI, Josef 25, chemin de la Pierraz CH-1066 Epalinges / CH | 02 /
DAENZER-ALLONCLE, Martine 10, Les Aubiers CH-1436 Treycovagnes / CH | 03 /
DESJARDINS, Jean-Jacques Chemin du Signal CH-1137 Yens / CH | 04 /
NEIDLINGER, Sylke 12, chemin de Chantemerle CH-1010 Lausanne / CH | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [2004/05] |
Former [2002/01] | Wavre, Claude-Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 00916887.3 | 02.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000EP01754 | Priority number, date | EP19990200914 | 24.03.1999 Original published format: EP 99200914 | EP19990201125 | 13.04.1999 Original published format: EP 99201125 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056171 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164870 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164870 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/164, A23L1/18 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A23L7/17 (EP,US);
A23L7/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Getreideriegel mit hohem Milchfeststoffanteil | [2003/33] | English: | Cereal bar with high milk solids content | [2003/33] | French: | Barre de céréale avec une teneur élevée en matières solides de lait | [2003/33] |
Former [2002/01] | GETREIDERIEGEL | ||
Former [2002/01] | CEREAL BAR | ||
Former [2002/01] | BARRE DE CEREALE | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 10.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 12.05.2004 | NL | 12.05.2004 | DK | 12.08.2004 | GR | 12.08.2004 | SE | 12.08.2004 | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/18] | FI | 12.05.2004 | |
DK | 12.08.2004 | ||
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 12.05.2004 | |
GR | 12.08.2004 | ||
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 12.05.2004 | |
SE | 12.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 12.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2437150 (BERG ISADORE A) [A] 1-8 * example III *; | [A]US3903308 (ODE VERNON H) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 23; example I *; | [A]US4650685 (PERSSON TYKO [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 49; examples 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP0431203 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,5-7 * column 4, line 35 - line 42 *; | [AP]EP0908106 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [AP] 5-7* the whole document * |