EP1083884 - PROCESS FOR THE STABILISATION OF POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/12] | STABILISED POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE FORMULATION | ||
[2002/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜHLER, Volker In den Weingärten 14 D-67157 Wachenheim / DE | 02 /
FILGES, Ulrich Otto-Dill-Str. 15 D-67433 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Tanja Niebelungenstr. 40 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | [2001/12] | Application number, filing date | 00917004.4 | 28.03.2000 | [2001/12] | WO2000EP02715 | Priority number, date | DE1999115420 | 06.04.1999 Original published format: DE 19915420 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0059478 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083884 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083884 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K47/32, C08K3/08 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/46 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/08, C08L39/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Extension states | RO | 06.12.2000 | SI | 06.12.2000 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON POLYVINYLPYRROLIDON-ZUBEREITUNGEN | [2002/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE STABILISATION OF POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE FORMULATIONS | [2002/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONES STABILISEES | [2002/01] |
Former [2001/12] | STABILISIERTE POLYVINYLPYRROLIDON-ZUBEREITUNGEN | ||
Former [2001/12] | STABILISED POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE FORMULATION | ||
Former [2001/12] | PREPARATIONS DE POLYVINYLPYRROLIDONE STABILISEES | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 18.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1513258 (BASF AG) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 1, line 39 - page 2, line 19 * * page 3, line 19 - line 21 * * page 3, line 29 - line 39 * * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,8-11,14 *; | [XY]EP0215379 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-9 * column 1, line 38 - line 47 * * column 2, line 46 - line 52 * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1,10,11; | [A]WO9112825 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [A] * example 1 *; | [X]EP0832846 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,9 * column 2, line 9 - line 27 * * column 6, line 4 - line 43 * * column 9, line 32 - line 39 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,5-7,11 *; | [XY] - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, ISBN: 0-917330-56-0, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION & THE PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITTAIN, (1986), XP002145873 [X] 1,2,10,11 * page 234 - page 239 * [Y] 1,10,11 | [ ] - PATEL DM, ET AL., Povidone [ ] * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0017] * |