EP1169410 - METHOD OF REDUCING FUMES FROM A VESSEL OF MOLTEN ASPHALT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo Ohio 43659 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMILION, Donn, R. 791 Cedar Run Road Newark, OH 43055 / US | 02 /
FRANZEN, Michael, R. 312 South Edgewood Lombard, IL 60148 / US | 03 /
JANICKI, Richard, T. 4347 West Kathleen Lane Oak Lawn, IL 60453 / US | 04 /
TRUMBORE, David, C. 208 South Brainard Avenue LaGrange, IL 60525 / US | 05 /
KEATING, Jay, W. 17007 South Eighty-Second Street Tinley Park, IL 60525 / US | 06 /
MARZARI, Jorge, A. 177 Periwinkle Lane Bolingbrook, IL 60440 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 00917806.2 | 09.03.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000US06085 | Priority number, date | US19990266972 | 12.03.1999 Original published format: US 266972 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0055280 | Date: | 21.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169410 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C10C3/02, C10C3/10 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B65B63/08 (EP,US);
C10C3/10 (EP,KR,US);
B65D43/0212 (EP,US);
B65D43/022 (EP,US);
B65D43/0231 (EP,US);
B65D65/46 (EP,US);
B65D81/00 (EP,US);
B65D85/00 (EP,US);
C08L95/00 (EP,US);
C09D195/00 (EP,US);
C09J195/00 (EP,US);
C10C3/02 (EP,US);
C10C3/026 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00194 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00305 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00509 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00546 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00555 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0062 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00685 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00731 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00796 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L95/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERMINDERUNG VON RAUCHGAS AUS EINEM KESSEL MIT GESCHMOLZENEM ASPHALT | [2002/02] | English: | METHOD OF REDUCING FUMES FROM A VESSEL OF MOLTEN ASPHALT | [2002/02] | French: | METHODE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LES FUMEES DEGAGEES PAR UN RECIPIENT CONTENANT DE L'ASPHALTE EN FUSION | [2002/02] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/33] | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5254385 (HAZLETT DARREN G [US]); | [A]DE4430819 (KRAIBURG GUMMI DEV GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO9640838 (OWENS CORNING FIBERGLASS CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,12-15,19-28 * figure -; claim - * [Y] 8-11,16-18; | [Y]EP0898018 (FIBRESCREED LTD [GB]) [Y] 8-11,16-18 * column 2, paragraph 13; claim - * |