EP1162920 - PLACEMENT GUIDE FOR ABLATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endocare, Inc. 7 Studebaker Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKUS, Paul, W. 53 Coastal Oak Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | 02 /
EUM, Jay, J. 5 Mistral Aliso Viejo, CA 92656 / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Wagner, Karl H., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Akers, Noel James, et al Howrey Simon Arnold & White Rembrandt Tower Amstelplein I 31st Floor 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2001/51] | Akers, Noel James Howrey Simon Arnold & White, CityPoint, One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 00917815.3 | 08.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US06155 | Priority number, date | US19990272889 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 272889 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056239 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162920 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/18 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00292 (EP,US);
A61B2017/4216 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0212 (EP,US);
A61B2090/034 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0463 (EP,US);
A61B2090/378 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | PLAZIERHILFE FÜR ABLATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN | [2001/51] | English: | PLACEMENT GUIDE FOR ABLATION DEVICES | [2001/51] | French: | GUIDE DE MISE EN PLACE POUR DISPOSITIFS D'ABLATION | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 30.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0178464 (XINTEC CORP [US]) [A] 1* page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 34; figures 15,16 *; | [A]DE9312792U (MAN CERAMICS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4223897 (DAUM WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]US5390661 (GRIFFITH JIM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 5, line 4 - column 6, line 3; figures 3-7 *; | [X]EP0694284 (DRAEGER MED ELECTRONICS BV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19539775 (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5390661 (GRIFFITH JIM [US], et al); | [A]US5800493 (STEVENS GAIL [US], et al); | [A]US5873815 (KERIN JOHN [AU], et al) |