EP1171180 - METHODS FOR TREATING ENDOLEAKS DURING ENDOVASCULAR REPAIR OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Therapeutics, Inc. 9775 Toledo Way Irvine CA 92618 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states MICRO THERAPEUTICS, INC. 2 Goodyear Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICCI, Charlie 23836 Sheffield Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
DOLMATCH, Bart 3160 Roundwood Road Hunting Valley, OH 44022 / US | 03 /
CRAGG, Andrew H. 4502 Edina Boulevard Edina, MN 55424 / US | 04 /
GREFF, Richard J. 2891 Alton Drive St. Pete Beach, FL 33706 / US | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | Audier, Philippe André, et al Brevalex, 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/03] | Des Termes, Monique, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00918171.0 | 20.03.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000US07399 | Priority number, date | US19990273120 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 273120 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0056380 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1171180 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61L24/00, A61L27/16, A61L27/50, A61M5/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
A61L24/06 (EP,US);
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61L24/001 (EP,US);
A61L24/08 (EP,US);
A61B17/00491 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3933 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
A61F2/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/06, C08L29/04 (EP,US);
A61L24/06, C08L33/04 (US,EP);
A61L24/08, C08L1/12 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | A61B17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2002/03] | A61M5/00, A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | 21.08.2001 | LT | 21.08.2001 | LV | 21.08.2001 | MK | 21.08.2001 | RO | 21.08.2001 | SI | 21.08.2001 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ENDOLECKAGEN WÄHREND DER ENDOVAKULÄREN AUSBESSERUNG VON BAUCHAORTENANEURYSMEN | [2002/03] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING ENDOLEAKS DURING ENDOVASCULAR REPAIR OF ABDOMINAL AORTIC ANEURYSMS | [2002/03] | French: | METHODES DE TRAITEMENT D'ENDOFUITES AU COURS DE LA REPARATION ENDOVASCULAIRE D'ANEVRISMES AORTIQUES ABDOMINAUX | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 04.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06107549 (NIPPON KANKO SHIKISO KENKYUSHO) [A] * abstract *; | [X]US5695480 (EVANS SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 4, lines 39-42,63,64 * * column 5, lines 38-42 *; | [X]US5851508 (GREFF RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * column 3, lines 32-37 * * column 4, lines 19-29 *; | [X] - SCHIE VAN G ET AL, "SUCCESSFUL EMBOLIZATION OF PERSISTENT ENDOLEAK FROM A PATENT INFERIOR MESENTERIC ARTERY", JOURNAL OF ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, FUTURA PUB., ARMONK, NY, US, (19970101), vol. 4, ISSN 1074-6218, pages 312 - 315, XP002929788 [X] 16-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1583/1074-6218(1997)004<0312:SEOPEF>2.0.CO;2 | International search | [Y]JPH06107549 (NIPPON KANKO SHIKISO KENKYUSHO); | [Y]US5695480 (EVANS SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US5749894 (ENGELSON ERIK T [US]); | [Y]US5749922 (SLEPIAN MARVIN J [US], et al); | [Y]US5868778 (GERSHONY GARY [US], et al); | [X] - VAN SCHUIE G. ET. AL., "Succesful Embolization of Persistent Endoleak From a Patent Inferior Mesenteric Artery", J. ENDOVASC SURG., (1997), vol. 4, pages 312 - 315, XP002930015 | [Y] - WHITE G. ET. AL., "Endoleak as a Complication of Endoluminal Grafting of Abdominal Aortic Aneurysms: Classification, Incidence, Diagnosis, and Management", J. ENDOVASC SURG., (1997), vol. 4, pages 152 - 168, XP002930016 | [Y] - WAIN R. ET. AL., "Endoleaks after Endovascular Garft Treatment of Aortic Aneurysms: Classification, Risk Factors, and Outcome", J. VASC. SURG., (199801), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 69 - 80, XP002930017 | [YP] - KARCH L. ET. AL., "Algorithm for the Diagnosis and Treatment of Endoleaks", AM. J. SURG., (199909), vol. 178, pages 225 - 231, XP002930018 |