EP1163610 - DATABASE AND INTERFACE FOR 3-DIMENSIONAL MOLECULAR STRUCTURE VISUALIZATION AND ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cengent Therapeutics, Inc. 10929 Technology Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Structural Bioinformatics Inc. 10929 Technology Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMNARAYAN, Kalyanaraman 11674 Springside Road San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
VESSAL, Behnam 657 Santa Camelia Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 03 /
KOTTALAM, Jeyapandian 751 Avenida Amigo San Marcos, CA 92069 / US | 04 /
FISHER, Cindy, L. 3905 Carta De Plata San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | 05 /
MOEZZI, Saied 10420 Caminito Alvarez San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 06 /
PRABHAKARAN, Muthuchidambaram 13267 Treecrest Street Poway, CA 92064 / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00918205.6 | 20.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000US07474 | Priority number, date | US19990272814 | 19.03.1999 Original published format: US 272814 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0057309 | Date: | 28.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1163610 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G16B50/00 (EP,US);
G16B15/20 (EP,US);
G16B15/00 (EP);
G16B45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | 24.09.2001 | LT | 24.09.2001 | LV | 24.09.2001 | MK | 24.09.2001 | RO | 24.09.2001 | SI | 24.09.2001 | Title | German: | DATENBANK UND SCHNITTSTELLE ZUR DARSTELLUNG UND ANALYSE VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN MOLEKULAREN STRUKTUREN | [2001/51] | English: | DATABASE AND INTERFACE FOR 3-DIMENSIONAL MOLECULAR STRUCTURE VISUALIZATION AND ANALYSIS | [2001/51] | French: | BASE DE DONNEES ET INTERFACE DE VISUALISATION ET D'ANALYSE D'UNE STRUCTURE MOLECULAIRE A 3 DIMENSIONS | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5699526 (SIEFERT DAVID M [US]) [X] 1-48 * column 6, line 47 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 21 *; | [A]US5859972 (SUBRAMANIAM SHANKAR [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 18; figure 10 *; | [X]US5864871 (KITAIN EDUARD [US], et al) [X] 1-48 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 11 *; | [X] - FERNANDEZ E B ET AL, "An abstract authorization system for the Internet", PROCEEDINGS NINTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS (CAT. NO.98EX130), PROCEEDINGS NINTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, VIENNA, AUSTRIA, 26-28 AUG. 1998, 1998, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc, USA, ISBN 0-8186-8353-8, pages 310 - 315, XP002158118 [X] 1-48 * page 3, column L, paragraph 4. - page 5, column L, line 18 * | [A] - IHLENFELDT W -D ET AL, "BEYOND THE HYPERACTIVE MOLECULE: SEARCH, SALVAGE AND VISUALIZATION OF CHEMICAL INFORMATION FROM THE INTERNET", PACIFIC SYMPOSIUM ON BIOCOMPUTING,SI,SINGAPORE, WORLD SCIENTIFIC, (19960103), vol. SYMP. 1, ISBN 981-02-2578-4, pages 384 - 395, XP000751937 [A] 1-48 * page 384, line 1 - page 385, line 5; figure 1 * * page 394, lines 17-19 * |