EP1181848 - ULTRAVIOLET CURABLE SILVER COMPOSITION AND RELATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allied Photochemical, Inc. 3939 Pine Grove Avenue Fort Gratiot, MI 48059 / US | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROHN, Roy, C. 3540 Orvall Drive Fort Gratiot, MI 48059 / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Chave, Lynne Fiona, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Chave, Lynne Fiona, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House, 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2004/14] | Pols, Ronald Maarten Urquhart-Dykes & Lord New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | ||
Former [2002/09] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 00918418.5 | 24.03.2000 | [2002/09] | WO2000US08018 | Priority number, date | US19990291774 | 14.04.1999 Original published format: US 291774 | US19990413577 | 06.10.1999 Original published format: US 413577 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0062586 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1181848 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1181848 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/09, G03F7/004 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H05K1/095 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (KR);
C08C19/25 (KR);
C08F22/40 (KR);
C08L83/10 (KR);
C09D175/16 (KR);
C09D4/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D4/06 (EP,US);
G03F7/0047 (EP,US);
G03F7/029 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/1811 (US,KR,EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/06 (EP,US);
C09D4/06, C08F290/14 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UV-HÄRTBARE SILBERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2002/09] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET CURABLE SILVER COMPOSITION AND RELATED METHOD | [2002/09] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ARGENT DURCISSABLE PAR ULTRAVIOLETS ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2002/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2007 | BE | 07.03.2007 | CH | 07.03.2007 | CY | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | FR | 07.03.2007 | IT | 07.03.2007 | LI | 07.03.2007 | NL | 07.03.2007 | LU | 24.03.2007 | IE | 26.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | ES | 18.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
CY | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
FR | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IT | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
FR | 26.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 26.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
BE | 07.03.2007 | ||
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 07.03.2007 | |
CH | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
NL | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
ES | 18.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | CH | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
LI | 07.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 07.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05311103 ; | [A]JPH0616721 ; | [A]EP0081323 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]); | [A]US4959178 (FRENTZEL RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 61 *; | [X]US5049480 (NEBE WILLIM J [US], et al) [X] 1,14,23 * column 11, line 28 - line 33 * * column 13, line 15 - line 39; examples 2,3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0820217 (DU PONT [US]) [A] * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 5; examples 4,5; claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 51, Database accession no. 1993-411062, XP002140476 & JPH05311103 A 19931122 (TANAKA KIKINZOKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,14,23 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 08, Database accession no. 1994-062080, XP002140477 & JPH0616721 A 19940125 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [A] 2,21,29,31 * abstract * |