EP1276798 - RESIDUAL GAS EXTRACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Thermo Polymers Limited 153 Van Kirk Drive Brampton Ontario L7A 1A4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Industrial Thermo Polymers Limited 153 Van Kirk Drive Brampton, Ontario L7A 1A4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTMAN, Hermann, David R.R. 4 Tottenham, Ontario L0G 1W0 / CA | 02 /
HARTMAN, Steven, David R.R. 2 Erin, Ontario N0B 1T0 / CA | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00918638.8 | 17.04.2000 | [2003/04] | WO2000CA00421 | Priority number, date | US20000491873 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: US 491873 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0155249 | Date: | 02.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1276798 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/36 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
C08J9/36 (EP,US);
B01J3/006 (EP,US);
B29C44/5609 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR RESTGASENTFERNUNG | [2003/04] | English: | RESIDUAL GAS EXTRACTION SYSTEM | [2003/04] | French: | SYSTEME D'EXTRACTION DE GAZ RESIDUELS | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/08] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS604038 ; | [X]WO8800114 (MAUDE AALTJE ELISABETH [AU], et al) [X] 17-20* claims 7,9 *; | [X]DE3900441 (SCHREIBER STAEDTEREINIGUNG GMB [DE]) [X] 1-22 * column 2, lines 56-61 * * claims 1,3,5,6,8,9,12,13 *; | [X]EP0672708 (SCHOELLHORN WOLF DIETRICH [DE]) [X] 1-22 * column 2, lines 26-30 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 08, Database accession no. 1985-046615, XP002144190 & JPS604038 A 19850110 (SANWA KAKO CO) [X] 1-22 * abstract * |