EP1173542 - BIOREACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röll, Marcel Alte Zürichstrasse 3 8124 Maur / CH | [2005/15] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Röll, Marcel In Reben 23 8315 Lindau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Schmauder, Klaus Dieter, et al Schmauder & Partner AG Patentanwälte Zwängiweg 7 8038 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00918654.5 | 03.05.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000CH00245 | Priority number, date | CH19990000828 | 04.05.1999 Original published format: CH 82899 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0066706 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1173542 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1173542 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
C12M23/14 (EP);
B01F31/23 (EP);
B01F35/513 (EP);
C12M23/46 (EP);
C12M27/16 (EP);
B01F35/51 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOREAKTOR | [2002/04] | English: | BIOREACTOR | [2002/04] | French: | BIOREACTEUR | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 25.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2006
07.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE Dr Vijay Singh 391 Mount Harmony Street Bernardsville NJ 07924 / US Opponent's representative Sörby, Lennart GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2006
07.02.2006
ADMISSIBLE Dr Vijay Singh 391 Mount Harmony Street Bernardsville NJ 07924 / US Opponent's representative Sörby, Lennart GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 75184 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.2006
Dr Vijay Singh 391 Mount Harmony Street Bernardsville NJ 07924 / US Opponent's representative Feldmann, Clarence Paul Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 8002 Zürich / CH | 28.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.09.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2008 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/09] | 03.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.10.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 20.04.2005 | IT | 20.04.2005 | NL | 20.04.2005 | AT | 03.05.2005 | CY | 03.05.2005 | LU | 03.05.2005 | BE | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | SE | 20.07.2005 | ES | 31.07.2005 | PT | 20.09.2005 | CH | 03.04.2006 | LI | 03.04.2006 | IE | 05.05.2008 | FR | 02.06.2008 | [2009/23] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
IT | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
CY | 03.05.2005 | ||
LU | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
CY | 03.05.2005 | ||
LU | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
CY | 03.05.2005 | ||
LU | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
CY | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.06.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 20.06.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
AT | 03.05.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
CH | 03.04.2006 | ||
LI | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
BE | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 20.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH037575 ; | [A]JPH0310676 ; | [Y]FR2519020 (SPOFA VEREINIGTE PHARMA WERKE [CS]) [Y] 1-6,9 * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 27; figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO8700548 (ALFA LAVAL FOOD ENG AB [SE]) [A] 1 * page 17; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP0258795 (KAWASUMI LAB INC [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9 * figure -; claims 1,3,5 *; | [A]US5523228 (INGRAM MARYLOU [US], et al); | [Y]EP0725134 (NPBI BV [NL]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,9* column 11, line 20 - line 25; figure 8; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910326), vol. 015, no. 123, Database accession no. (C - 0816), & JP03007575 A 19910114 (SHIMADZU CORP) [Y] 1-6,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910328), vol. 015, no. 128, Database accession no. (C - 0818), & JP03010676 A 19910118 (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |