EP1161767 - Method of making a vertical MOS transistor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/50] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BODY AREA FOR A VERTICAL MOS TRANSISTOR ARRAY WITH REDUCED SPECIFIC STARTING RESISTOR | ||
[2010/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRLER, Franz Mozartstrasse 4 D-84424 Isen / DE | 02 /
KANERT, Werner Otto-Mair-Ring 31 D-83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 03 /
GASSEL, Helmut 37007 Ashover Court Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US | 04 /
STRACK, Helmut Speyerer Strasse 6 D-80804 München / DE | 05 /
PAIRITSCH, Herbert Neckheimgasse 24 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Bickel, Michael Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Bickel, Michael Herzog-Wilhelm-Str. 26 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | Bickel, Michael Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Mozartstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00918684.2 | 03.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000DE00677 | Priority number, date | DE19991009563 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909563 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0052750 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1161767 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161767 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/331, H01L21/265, H01L21/225, H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L29/10 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/0634 (EP,US);
H01L29/1095 (EP,US);
H01L29/66734 (EP,US);
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L29/66333 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | H01L21/336, H01L21/331, H01L29/10, H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L21/225 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer vertikalen MOS-Transistoranordnung | [2010/47] | English: | Method of making a vertical MOS transistor device | [2010/47] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif à transistor MOS vertical | [2010/47] |
Former [2001/50] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BODYGEBIETES FÜR EINE VERTIKALE MOS-TRANSISTORANORDNUNG MIT VERRINGERTEM SPEZIFISCHEM EINSCHALTWIDERSTAND | ||
Former [2001/50] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BODY AREA FOR A VERTICAL MOS TRANSISTOR ARRAY WITH REDUCED SPECIFIC STARTING RESISTOR | ||
Former [2001/50] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ZONE DE CORPS POUR UN ENSEMBLE TRANSISTOR MOS VERTICAL PRESENTANT UNE RESISTANCE AU DECLENCHEMENT SPECIFIQUE REDUITE | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10009591.8 / EP2261961 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/08] | IE | 18.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XA]JPS6448464 ; | [Y]JPH09213939 ; | [Y]JPS57188877 ; | [DY]US4837606 (GOODMAN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [DY] 1-8 * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 63; figures 2,3 * * column 6, line 9 - line 47 *; | [E]EP1009036 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [E] 1,2,5-7 * column 2, line 29 - column 5, line 4; figures 1-6 ** column 6, line 24 - line 32 *; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890609), vol. 013, no. 248, Database accession no. (E - 770), & JP01048464 A 19890222 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * Spalten 6,7;Abbildungen 1,3-5 * [A] 4-6 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, & JP09213939 A 19970815 (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * Absätze 0022,0025,0040,0041; Abbildungen 1,2,4,5 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830215), vol. 007, no. 036, Database accession no. (E - 158), & JP57188877 A 19821119 (NIPPON DENKI KK) [Y] 3-8 * abstract * | [A] - DEBOY G ET AL, "NEW GENERATION OF HIGH VOLTAGE MOSFETS BREAKS THE LIMIT LINE OF SILICON", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, TECHNICAL DIGEST, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (19981206), ISBN 0-7803-4775-7, pages 683 - 685, XP000859463 [A] 1,4 * abstract * * Absatz "Technology"; Abbildung 2 * | by applicant | JPS57188877 | JPS6448464 | JPH09213939 | - DEBOY ET AL., "International Electron Devices Meeting", TECHNICAL DIGEST, (19981206), pages 683 - 685 |