Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1182766 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2006 | B1 | EP1182766 | 02.10.2002 | A4 | EP1182766 | 27.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP11286499 | 20.04.1999 | JP0002566 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60031525T | 15.02.2007 | T2 | DE60031525D1 | 07.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP11286499 | 20.04.1999 | JP0002566 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6700279 | 02.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP11286499 | 20.04.1999 | JP0002566 | 20.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0064036 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP11286499 | 20.04.1999 |