EP1155544 - INTERLEAVING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ORTHOGONAL TRANSMIT DIVERSITY AND MULTI-CARRIERS CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jiangnan 602 70th Street Darien, IL 60561 / US | 02 /
JALLOUL, Louay Apartment 104, 1501 Churchill Drive Palatine, IL 60067 / US | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Openshaw, Paul Malcolm, et al Openshaw & Co. Town Hall Exchange The Town Hall Buildings Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7ND / GB | ||
Former [2001/47] | Potts, Susan Patricia Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919304.6 | 15.02.2000 | [2001/47] | WO2000US03904 | Priority number, date | US19990120084P | 16.02.1999 Original published format: US 120084 P | US20000503021 | 14.02.2000 Original published format: US 503021 | [2001/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0049780 | Date: | 24.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155544 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155544 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/49, H04J13/00, H03M13/27 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
H04L1/0059 (EP,US);
H04B14/04 (KR);
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/0083 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/47] | H04L25/49, H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERSCHACHTELUNGSVERFAHREN UND -EINRICHTUNG ZUR ORTHOGONALEN SENDDIVERSITÄT UND FÜR MEHRTRÄGER-CDMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEME | [2005/47] | English: | INTERLEAVING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ORTHOGONAL TRANSMIT DIVERSITY AND MULTI-CARRIERS CDMA COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2001/47] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ENTRELACEMENT POUR SYSTEMES DE TELECOMMUNICATION D'AMCR A ONDES PORTEUSES MULTIPLESET A DIVERSITE DE TRANSMISSION ORTHOGONALE | [2001/47] |
Former [2001/47] | VERSCHACHTELUNGSVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG ZUR ORTHOGONALEN SENDDIVERSITÄT SO WIE MEHRTRÄGER-CDMA-VERMITTLUNGSYSTEMEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Request for further processing for: | 08.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.08.2006 | SE | 23.11.2006 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
SE | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 23.08.2006 | |
SE | 23.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2317540 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-20 * page 8, line 33 - page 12, line 11; figures 9-13 *; | [A]EP0744841 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [XP] - JALLOUL L M A ET AL, "PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF CDMA TRANSMIT DIVERSITY METHODS", VTC 1999-FALL. IEEE VTS 50TH. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. GATEWAY TO THE 21ST. CENTURY COMMUNICATIONS VILLAGE. AMSTERDAM, SEPT. 19 - 22, 1999, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (199909), vol. 3 CONF. 50, ISBN 0-7803-5436-2, pages 1326 - 1330, XP002929408 [XP] 1-20 * paragraph "4. INTERLEAVING FOR TD";; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.1999.801478 | International search | [XE]US6064664 (KIM JUNG-SIK [KR]) | [XP] - ROHANI ET. AL., "Performance Analysis of CDMA Transmit Diversity Methods", IEEE, (199904), pages 1326 - 1330, XP002929408 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.1999.801478 |