EP1179034 - MIXTURES OF SYMMETRICAL AND UNSYMMETRICAL RED REACTIVE DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Everlight USA, Inc. 10570 Southern Loop Boulevard Pineville, NC 26134 / US | [2002/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeh, Ming-Mei No. 7, Lane 1, Alley 568 Chung San S. Road Yangmei Tao Yuan Hsien / TW | 02 /
Chang, Ting-Jui 56 Farm Ming Feng Village Ba Nan Taitung Hsien / TW | 03 /
Lee, Sheena 4F., No. 21, Alley 143, Sec. 3 Jen Ai Road Taipei City / TW | 04 /
Yin, Da-Jong 2F., No. 4, Lane 7, Alley 22, Sec. 2 Sing Lung Rd Taipei City / TW | [2002/07] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Bloch, Gérard Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | Bloch, Gérard Cabinet Bloch & Associés 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/07] | Bloch, Gérard Bloch & Associés Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 2 Square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 00919391.3 | 29.03.2000 | [2002/07] | WO2000US06434 | Priority number, date | US19990305300 | 05.05.1999 Original published format: US 305300 | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068319 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1179034 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179034 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/24, D06P1/382, D06P3/66, C09B67/00, C09B62/04 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
D06P1/382 (EP,US);
C09B67/0057 (EP,US);
Y10S8/918 (US);
Y10S8/924 (US)
|
Former IPC [2002/07] | C09B67/24, D06P1/382, D06P3/66 | Designated contracting states | FR, IT, PT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNGEN SYMMETRISCHER UND UNSYMMETRISCHER ROTER REAKTIVFARBSTOFFE | [2002/07] | English: | MIXTURES OF SYMMETRICAL AND UNSYMMETRICAL RED REACTIVE DYES | [2002/07] | French: | MELANGES DE COLORANTS REACTIFS ROUGES SYMETRIQUES ET DISSYMETRIQUES | [2002/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2001 | Search fee paid | 05.12.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 09.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2028479 (ICI LTD) [Y] 1-17* page 1, line 6 - line 27; examples 33,61,78,82,92,94 *; | [Y]EP0832940 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]GB1529645 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [AP]US5928387 (RUHLMANN EDMOND [FR], et al) |