EP1161227 - MICROPARTICLES FOR DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Inc. 100 Tice Boulevard Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Eisai Corporation of North America 100 Tice Boulevard Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 / US | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states MGI PHARMA Biologics, Inc. 35 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states MGI PHARMA Biologics, Inc. 763 East Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Zycos Inc. 763 East Concord Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNSFORD, Lynn, B. 151 North Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
PUTNAM, David 143 Otis Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | 03 /
HEDLEY, Mary, Lynne 51 Follen Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | Arends, William Gerrit, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2001/50] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919403.6 | 10.03.2000 | [2001/50] | WO2000US06578 | Priority number, date | US19990266463 | 11.03.1999 Original published format: US 266463 | US19990321346 | 27.05.1999 Original published format: US 321346 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0053161 | Date: | 14.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1161227 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161227 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K48/00, C12N15/88 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/88 (EP);
A61K39/0008 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/205 (EP);
A61K39/292 (EP);
A61K9/1617 (EP);
A61K9/1647 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K2039/53 (EP);
A61K2039/55555 (EP);
A61K2039/55566 (EP);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
A61K2039/6093 (EP);
C12N2710/20022 (EP);
C12N2710/20034 (EP);
C12N2730/10134 (EP);
C12N2760/20234 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROPARTIKEL ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2001/50] | English: | MICROPARTICLES FOR DELIVERY OF NUCLEIC ACID | [2001/50] | French: | MICROPARTICULES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE L'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2001/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.01.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.03.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2008 | Decision despatched | 19.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2660556 (RHONE POULENC SANTE [FR]) [A] 1-75 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0761211 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-75 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9831398 (PANGAEA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10,14-45,48-56,60-75 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9831346 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,34,35,37-44,46,47,49-51,53-55,57-69,71-75 * abstract * * page 5, line 28 - page 7, line 2 * * page 9, line 11 - page 15, line 20 * * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 14 * * claims 1,5,6,11,12,14-16 *; | [A]WO9851279 (MICROBIOLOGICAL RES AUTHORITY [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0003660 (SKYEPHARMA INC [US]) [PX] 1-6,34-42,44,46-50,53-55,57,58,63-68,71-75 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 28 * * page 11, line 1 - page 18, line 16; claims 1,7-10,17 ** page 1 *; | [A] - GHADERI, RAOUF ET AL, "Effect of preparative parameters on the characteristics of poly (DL- lactide -co- glycolide ) microspheres made by the double emulsion method", INT. J. PHARM. (1996), 141(1,2), 205-216, XP000946093 [A] 1-75 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(96)04639-X | [A] - ALONSO MARIA J ET AL, "Determinants of release rate of tetanus vaccine from polyester microspheres.", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH (NEW YORK), (1993), vol. 10, no. 7, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 945 - 953, XP000946086 [A] 1-75 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1018942118148 | by applicant | US5580959 |