EP1166241 - VENDING MACHINE WHICH MINIMISES AGITATION OF GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta Georgia 30313 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIESEL, Lawrence, B. 5012 Towne Lake Hills North Woodstock, GA 30189 / US | 02 /
MILLER, John, S. 392 Kite Lake Road Fayetteville, GA 30214 / US | 03 /
MAYNE, Michael, C. 2600 White Road Conyers, GA 30012 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Robert Patrick Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Jackson, Robert Patrick Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00919792.2 | 30.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000US08300 | Priority number, date | US19990283573 | 01.04.1999 Original published format: US 283573 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0060554 | Date: | 12.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166241 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166241 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/62 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G07F9/02 (EP,US);
G07F11/10 (EP,US);
G07F11/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKAUFSAUTOMAT, DER GÜTER MINIMAL SCHÜTTELT | [2002/01] | English: | VENDING MACHINE WHICH MINIMISES AGITATION OF GOODS | [2002/01] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR AUTOMATIQUE A FACE AVANT TRANSPARENTE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 21.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/30] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2008 | BE | 13.08.2008 | CY | 13.08.2008 | DK | 13.08.2008 | FI | 13.08.2008 | NL | 13.08.2008 | SE | 13.11.2008 | GR | 14.11.2008 | PT | 13.01.2009 | IE | 30.03.2009 | IT | 30.03.2009 | LU | 30.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
IT | 30.03.2009 | ||
LU | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
IT | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
GR | 14.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
SE | 13.11.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
IE | 30.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
PT | 13.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
BE | 13.08.2008 | ||
DK | 13.08.2008 | ||
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 13.08.2008 | |
FI | 13.08.2008 | ||
NL | 13.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 13.08.2008 | |
NL | 13.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3834584 (STUTE W) [Y] 24* column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 11; figure . *; | [Y]FR2533811 (JUILLET HUBERT [FR]) [Y] 2-4,21-23,28 * page 4, line 130 - line 161; figures 1,4 *; | [YA]US4494675 (STUTSMAN RICHARD R [US]) [Y] 12,31 * column 3, line 22 - line 42; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,2,4,8,18-21,23,29,35,40,41,43; | [YA]US4721197 (HOFFMAN ARLAN [US]) [Y] 5-8,10,25-27,29 * column 1, line 49 - line 52; figure - * [A] 1,9,11,19,28,30,36,37,40,41; | [XY]WO9101536 (DAUCHY PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1,19,20 * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 11; figure 3 * * page 7, line 14 - line 23; figure 8 * [Y] 2-12,21-31,35,40,41,43,44; | [Y]FR2692769 (GODEUX MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 12,31 * page 6, paragraph L - page 7, line 1; figure 2 *; | [XAY]US5499707 (STEURY RUDY [US]) [X] 36-39,41 * column 5, line 33 - line 48; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,5,18,19,24,25,35 [Y] 6-11,26-30,40,44; | [PYA]US5971205 (MICHAELS PETER T [US], et al) [PY] 6-8,10,29,35,40,41,43 * column 11, line 41 - line 56; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,9,11,18,19,28,30,36,37 | by applicant | US4108333 |