Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4334149B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2009 | B2 | JP2003500852 | 07.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4103100 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1183699 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2003 | B1 | EP1183699 | 06.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE237184T | 15.04.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG64328B | 30.09.2004 | B1 | BG105989 | 31.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0008256 | 15.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50001720D1 | 15.05.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50001720 | 29.02.2000 | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1042160 | 15.08.2003 | B | HK1042160 | 02.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL193253B | 31.01.2007 | B1 | PL351679 | 02.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA59490 | 15.09.2003 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6495779 | 17.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP0001691 | 29.02.2000 | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0072341 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100649087B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2006 | B1 | KR20010112495 | 20.12.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1130738C | 10.12.2003 | C | CN1350692 | 22.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20014188 | 13.02.2002 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19923722 | 12.10.2000 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2191617T | 16.09.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2234756 | 20.08.2004 | C2 | Priority number | Date | DE19923722 | 22.05.1999 |