EP1165939 - CAST GAS TURBINE BLADE THAT IS FLOWN THROUGH BY A COOLANT AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DISTRIBUTION CHAMBER FOR THE GAS TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.2004 [2004/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIEMANN, Peter Gerichtsstrasse 4 D-58452 Witten / DE | [2002/01] | Application number, filing date | 00920564.2 | 23.03.2000 | [2002/01] | WO2000EP02606 | Priority number, date | EP19990106454 | 29.03.1999 Original published format: EP 99106454 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0058606 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1165939 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1165939 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/33] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KÜHLMITTELDURCHSTRÖMTE, GEGOSSENE GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERTEILERRAUMS DER GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2002/01] | English: | CAST GAS TURBINE BLADE THAT IS FLOWN THROUGH BY A COOLANT AND DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DISTRIBUTION CHAMBER FOR THE GAS TURBINE BLADE | [2002/01] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE A GAZ MOULEE PARCOURUE PAR UN REFRIGERANT, ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CHAMBRE DISTRIBUTRICE POUR L'AUBE DE TURBINE | [2002/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 12.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3582230 (SCHMIDT DAVID, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11 * column 2, line 69 - line 75; figure 3 *; | [X]GB2224082 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,11 * figure - *; | [A]EP0894941 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]US3918835 (YAMARIK GEORGE J, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 14 - line 15; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4203705 (WESBECHER JAMES J [US]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * | by applicant | US4344738 | US4992026 |