Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4567206B | Global Dossier | 20.10.2010 | B2 | JP2002540347 | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 | EP0002606 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1165939 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2003 | B1 | EP1165939 | 02.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 | EP00920564 | 23.03.2000 | EP0002606 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50003266D1 | 18.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 | EP0002606 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6565318 | 20.05.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 | EP0002606 | 23.03.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0058606 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1041246 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99106454 | 29.03.1999 |