Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1084575

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 ITLapse: 10.10.2012
 SELapse: 10.10.2012
Examination procedure28.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase02.01.2001National basic fee paid 
12.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
31.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
European patent granted10.10.2012
Opposition procedure11.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit published on 18.09.2013 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:13.06.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010412
 
Event date:19.05.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20070524
 
Event date:10.10.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:10.10.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:13.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 60047561 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20121213
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121010
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20121010
 
Event date:18.09.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20130711
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 60047561 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
Effective DATE:20130711
 
Event date:28.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL
Effective DATE:20121010
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:VOLMER, GEORG, DIPL.-ING., DE
Effective DATE:20140328
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
OWNER:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., NL
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., EINDHOVEN, NL
Effective DATE:20140328
 
Event date:02.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CD
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME
OWNER:KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V., NL
Effective DATE:20141126
 
Event date:02.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CA
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Effective DATE:20141126
 
Event date:07.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE
Effective DATE:20140328
 
Event date:31.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:07.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE
 
Event date:08.05.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60047561 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE
Effective DATE:20140328
 
Event date:27.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20190328
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20190327
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20190528
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.03.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 60047561 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:22.04.2020 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20200328
 
Event date:01.05.2020 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20200328
 
Event date:07.09.2012 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:31.08.2012 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:08.05.2012 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:02.02.2001 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:16.08.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:16.08.2013 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261