EP1175533 - ROAD NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/05] | ROAD NETWORK DEVICE AND COVERING ELEMENT THEREFOR | ||
[2005/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain PAM 91, Avenue de la Libération 54000 Nancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN PAM 91, Avenue de la Libération 54000 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUER, Jean-Claude 9, rue de Bretagne F-54420 Saulxures lès Nancy / FR | 02 /
PIETRZAK, Jean-Paul 25, rue du Bois le Prêtre F-54700 Blenod lès Pont à Mousson / FR | [2002/05] | Application number, filing date | 00920851.3 | 20.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000FR01033 | Priority number, date | FR19990005717 | 05.05.1999 Original published format: FR 9905717 | [2002/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068517 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175533 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175533 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
E02D29/1427 (EP,US);
E02D29/1418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 17.10.2001 | SI | 17.10.2001 | Title | German: | STRASSENBAUEINRICHTUNG | [2005/31] | English: | ROAD NETWORK DEVICE | [2005/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VOIRIE | [2005/31] |
Former [2002/05] | STRASSENBAUEINRICHTUNG UND DECKEL FÜR EINE DERARTIGE EINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2002/05] | ROAD NETWORK DEVICE AND COVERING ELEMENT THEREFOR | ||
Former [2002/05] | DISPOSITIF DE VOIRIE ET ELEMENT DE RECOUVREMENT POUR UN TEL DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 18.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 18.01.2006 | |
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | DK | 18.04.2006 | |
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | DK | 18.04.2006 | |
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | DK | 18.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]GB529826 (DUDLEY & DOWELL LTD, et al) [Y] 8,13 * page 3, line 107 - page 4, line 23; figures 3,4 * [A] 9-11; | [A]US4567697 (HAHNE WALTER B [US]) [A] 2* column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 64; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP0451064 (SODIF SA [FR]) [A] 2,3,12 * column 4, lines 4-21; figure 6 *; | [XAY]US5362174 (YANG JENG-YIH [TW]) [X] 1,4,5,14 * column 2, lines 4-61; figures 3-5 * [A] 11 [Y] 8,13 |