21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
28.09.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
20.10.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
20.10.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
03.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.10.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
12.05.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2005 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
06.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2004 |
Change - designated states |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
01.07.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.07.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
09.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.12.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
06.12.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
07.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|