EP1278023 - DUCT JOINT STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air System Kabushiki Kaisha 159-1, Otsu, Abo Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0944 / JP | [2006/47] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Air System Kabushiki Kaisha 159-1, Otsu, Abo Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0944 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IIZUKA, Shozo 15-29, Johokushinmachi 1-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670-0883 / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Piésold, Alexander J., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00921044.4 | 27.04.2000 | [2003/04] | WO2000JP02746 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0184058 | Date: | 08.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1278023 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278023 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/02 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
F24F13/0254 (EP,US);
F24F13/02 (KR);
B21D39/00 (US);
B21D39/021 (EP);
F24F13/0209 (EP,US);
Y10S138/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2003/04] | English: | DUCT JOINT STRUCTURE | [2003/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE JOINT DE CONDUIT | [2003/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2002 | Translation filed | 24.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.11.2006 | GB | 27.04.2007 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 27.04.2007 | |
FR | 13.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GB | 27.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE6907503U (HEINRICH BRINKMANN KG FA [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5996644 (IIZUKA SHOZO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH07234005 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]JPH1047741 (J A M KK); | [Y]JPS58127279U |