EP1163031 - DEVICE FOR RESTORING THE GRASS SURFACE OF A GOLF GREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pulo Innovation HB Möjbrovägen 15 168 54 Bromma / SE | [2001/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLDNE, Lars Möjbrovägen 15 S-168 54 Bromma / SE | 02 /
PERSSON, Urban Fortvägen 33 S-187 64 Täby / SE | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Eriksson, Kjell Norrtelje Patentbyra AB P.O.B. 38 761 21 Norrtälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Eriksson, Kjell Norrtelje Patentbyra AB, P.O.B. 38 761 21 Norrtälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 00921225.9 | 21.03.2000 | [2001/51] | WO2000SE00546 | Priority number, date | SE19990001106 | 25.03.1999 Original published format: SE 9901106 | [2001/51] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0057964 | Date: | 05.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163031 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A63B57/00 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
A63B57/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CORRICHTUNG ZUM WIEDERHERSTELLEN DER GRASFLÄCHE EINES GOLFGREENS | [2001/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR RESTORING THE GRASS SURFACE OF A GOLF GREEN | [2001/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REPARER LA SURFACE HERBEUSE D'UN GREEN DE GOLF | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2000 | Translation filed | 21.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8914699U ; | [A]US5511785 ; | [A]US4925190 ; | [A]US5377977 ; | [A]US4862970 |