EP1198505 - CARBONATE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS STABILIZED AGAINST DISCOLORATION AND PHYSICAL PROPERTY DETERIORATION DURING STERILIZATION BY IONIZING RADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLEECKX, Jozef, Julius Driesmeers 16 B-9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00921761.3 | 06.04.2000 | [2002/17] | WO2000US09114 | Priority number, date | US19990325249 | 03.06.1999 Original published format: US 325249 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075223 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1198505 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1198505 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/43, C08K5/06, C08L69/00 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
C08K5/43 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2203/02 (KR);
C08L2666/18 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/06, C08L69/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/43, C08L69/00 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L71/00 (US,EP);
C08L71/02, C08L2666/18 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/02] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBONATPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, STABILISIERT GEGEN VERFÄRBUNG UND VERÄNDERUNG DER PHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN BEI STERILISATION DURCH IONISIERENDE STRAHLUNG | [2002/17] | English: | CARBONATE POLYMER COMPOSITIONS STABILIZED AGAINST DISCOLORATION AND PHYSICAL PROPERTY DETERIORATION DURING STERILIZATION BY IONIZING RADIATION | [2002/17] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE RESISTANT A LA DECOLORATION ET A LA DETERIORATION DES PROPRIETES PHYSIQUES PENDANT LA STERILISATION PAR RAYONNEMENT IONISANT | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/17] | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMERE DE CARBONE RESISTANT A LA DECOLORATION ET A LA DETERIORATION DES PROPRIETES PHYSIQUES PENDANT LA STERILISATION PAR RAYONNEMENT IONISANT | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 29.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.04.2004 | [2005/45] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8604911 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,6-10 * example - *; | [A]US4782103 (OGOE SAMUEL A [US]) [A] 1,6,7 * example - *; | [A]WO9324571 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * claims 1,4,5,9,10 *; | [AD]EP0664321 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-24* page 6, line 63 - page 7, line 14; example -; claims 1-6 * |