EP1171133 - R-HYDROXYNEFAZODONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepracor Inc. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2006/22] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Sepracor Inc. 111 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBERICH, Timothy, J. 40 Elm Street Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
RUBIN, Paul, D. 37 Greystone Lane Sudbury, MA 01752 / US | 03 /
YELLE, William, E. 20 Ernie's Drive Littleton, MA 01460 / US | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 00921896.7 | 07.04.2000 | [2002/03] | WO2000US09373 | Priority number, date | US19990128479P | 09.04.1999 Original published format: US 128479 P | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0061128 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1171133 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1171133 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/496, A61P25/24 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07D249/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/03] | A61K31/496, A61P25/00, A61P3/04, A61P25/24, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | R-HYDROXYNEFAZODON | [2002/03] | English: | R-HYDROXYNEFAZODONE | [2002/03] | French: | HYDROXY-NEFAZODONE R | [2002/03] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 22.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | BE | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
BE | 21.06.2006 | ||
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4338317 (TEMPLE JR DAVIS L, et al) [A] 1,19-26 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 11 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 21 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 25 * * claims 1-3 *; | [DX]US4613600 (GAMMANS RICHARD E [US], et al) [DX] 1,19-27 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 12 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 18 * * column 4, line 51 - line 64 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 50 * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]US5256664 (MAYOL ROBERT F [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 27 - line 46 * * column 3, line 7 - line 61 *; | [X]US5788986 (DODMAN NICHOLAS H [US]) [X] 23-25,27 * abstract * * column 12, line 32 - line 67 * * column 14, line 1 - line 19 * * column 21, line 1 - line 6 * * table 2 * * column 23, line 33 - line 63 * * column 24, line 11 - line 37 * * claims 1,6 *; | [X] - CYR M ET AL, "NEFAZODONE: ITS PLACE AMONG ANTIDEPRESSANTS", ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHERAPY,XX,XX, (19960901), vol. 30, no. 9, ISSN 1060-0280, pages 1006 - 1012, XP000613004 [X] 1 * page 1006, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 1007, column 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * | [DX] - MALIK, KEMAL, "Nefazodone: structure, mode of action and pharmacokinetics", J. PSYCHOPHARMACOL., (1996), vol. 10 (Suppl. 1), pages 1 - 4, XP000861812 [DX] 1 * abstract * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 3, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [A] - NACCA ANGELO; GUISO GIOVANNA; FRACASSO CLAUDIA; CERVO LUIGI; CACCIA SILVIO, "Brain-to-blood partition and in vivo inhibition of 5-hydroxytryptamine reuptake and quipazine-mediated behaviour of nefazodone and its main active metabolites in rodents.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (199812), vol. 125, no. 7, pages 1617 - 1623, XP000861819 [A] 1,20,21,23,24 * page 1617, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1618, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 1619, column 2, paragraph 3 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702251 | [A] - MONTGOMERY S A, "EFFICACY OF NEFAZODONE IN THE TREATMENT OF DEPRESSION", JOURNAL OF PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY,GB,OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1996), vol. 10, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0269-8811, pages 5 - 10, XP000613043 [A] 1,19-22 * abstract * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 9, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * | [A] - GREENE D S ET AL, "Clinical pharmacokinetics of nefazodone.", CLINICAL PHARMACOKINETICS, (1997 OCT) 33 (4) 260-75. REF: 51, XP000911986 [A] * abstract * * page 261, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2 * * page 269, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 273, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 273, column 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * | [A] - SCHMIDER J ET AL, "Inhibition of cytochrome P450 by nefazodone in vitro: studies of dextromethorphan O- and N-demethylation.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (1996 APR) 41 (4) 339-43., XP000861967 [A] * abstract * * page 339, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 340, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 342, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2125.1996.30512.x |