EP1169445 - HUMAN PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curagen Corporation 11th floor, 555 Long Wharf Drive New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDEZ, Elma 77 Florence Road 2B Branford, CT 06405 / US | 02 /
VERNET, Corine 4830 N.W. 43rd Street P 253 Gainesville, FL 32060 / US | 03 /
SHIMKETS, Richard 191 Leete Street West Haven, CT 06516 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [2008/32] |
Former [2005/41] | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/09] | Taylor, Kathryn May Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [2004/47] | Crump, Julian Richard John Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2002/02] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00921910.6 | 07.04.2000 | [2002/02] | WO2000US09392 | Priority number, date | US19990128514P | 09.04.1999 Original published format: US 128514 P | US20000186592P | 03.03.2000 Original published format: US 186592 P | US20000544511 | 06.04.2000 Original published format: US 544511 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0061754 | Date: | 19.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1169445 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/24, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C07K16/18, C07K16/24, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68, A61K38/17, A61K38/20, A61K49/00, A61K31/70, A61K39/395 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/54 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE PROTEINE UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE | [2007/52] | English: | HUMAN PROTEINS AND POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING THEM | [2002/02] | French: | NOUVELLES PROTEINES HUMAINES ET POLYPEPTIDES CODANT POUR CES PROTEINES | [2002/02] |
Former [2002/02] | MENSCHLICHE PROTEINS UND DAFÜR KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2006 | 30.04.2007 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2007 | 30.04.2008 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXA]WO9849310 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [DX] 59 * 90,55% identity in 180 aa overlap with seq ID no.2 (1-178:1-180) * * 97,48% identity in 714 nt overlap with seq ID no.1 (1-708:2-706) *; page 29 - page 33; claim - * * Sequences ID no.1 and no.2 pages 53-55 * [A] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,59,61-63,65,67,69,71; | [DXA]WO9903982 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [DX] 59 * 90,56% identity in 180 aa overlap with seq ID no.2 (1-178:1-180) * * 99,85% identity in 694 nt overlap with seq ID no.1 (21-708:1-694) *;; figure 1; example -; claim - * [A] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,61-63,65,67,69,71; | [DXA]WO9630052 (UMDNJ NEW JERSEY S UNIVERSITY [US]) [DX] 59 * claim - * [A] ; | [A]WO9845437 (GENETICS INST [US]) [A] 5,13,14,17,20 * 97,89% identity in 465nt overlap between seq ID no.21 and seq ID no.415 (533-997:17-481) * * sequence ID no.415 *; | [XDA]WO9906552 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [XD] 13 * 100% identity in 84 aa overlap with seq ID no.20 (1-84:1-84) * sequence ID no.404 page 374 * [A] 5,14; | [A]WO9906548 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [A] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,59,61-63,65,67,69,71 * 99,5% identity in 435 nt overlap between seq ID.21 and no.40 (527-961:4-438) * * sequence ID no.40 page 30 * * abstract *; | [DXA]WO9627603 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [DX] 59 * 97% identity in 137 aa overlap with seq ID no.22 and fig.24 (1-137:1-138) and 98% identity in 450nt overlap between seq ID 21 and fig.24 (548-997:3-452) *;; figures 17,24 * [A] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,58,61-63,65,67,69,71; | [PX]WO9963088 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-4,6,10-12,15,16,18,19,21-23 * fig.228 has 100% identity with the whole sequence ID no.26 and fig.227 has 99,72% identity in 1071 nt overlap with seq ID no.25 (29-1099:524-1593) * * 99,25% identity in 269 aa overlap with seq ID no.28(1-269:193-461) and 99,62% identity in 1054 nt overlap with seq ID no.27 (1-1054:540-1593) *;; figures 227,228 * * page 203, line 3 - page 205, line 4 *; | [PX]WO0012708 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PX] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,59,61-63,65,67,69,71 * 100% identity between sequence ID no.20 and figure no.20 and 100% identity in 1208 nt overlap with seq ID no19 (1-1208:8-1215) *;; figures 19,20 * * example -; claim - * * page 56 - page 58 *; | [PX]WO9958668 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PX] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,59,61-63,65,67,69,71 * 99,7% identity in 344 aa overlap with seq ID no.6* * 99,9% identity in 1032 nt overlap with seq ID no.3 (92-1123:1-1032) * * 99,7% identity in 313 aa overlap with seq ID no.4 (1-344:1-344) * * Sequences ID no.1, 2, 5 and 6 *; | [PA]WO9918126 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [PA] 5,13,14,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,59,61-63,65,67,69,71 * 97% identity in 137 aa overlap between seq ID 22 and seq ID no.34 * * 98% identity in 463 nt overlap between seq ID no.21 and no.36 (535-997:1-463) * * sequence ID no.34 and no.36 *; | [PA]WO9960127 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [PA] 5,13,14,17,20 * 98,46% identity in 716 nt overlap with seq ID no.1 (1-708:116-830) * * 90 identity with seq ID no.2 * * 99,12% identity in 686 nt overlap with seq ID no.1(24-703:1-686) * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [DPX]WO9946281 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [DPX] 5,13,14,17,20 * fig.221 has 99,9% identity with seq ID no.3 in 1603 nt overlap (1-1603:43-1645) * *fig.197 has 99,125% identity in 686 nt overlap with seq ID 1 (24-703:1-686) * * fig.222 has 99,41% identity in 344 aa overlap with seq ID no.6 and no.4 (1-344:1-343) *;; figures 197,198,221,222 *; | [DPA]WO9935267 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [DPA] 5,13,14,17,20 * 98,8% identity in 540 nt overlap with seq ID no.1 (65-598:1-540) and 90,56% identity in 180 aa overlap with seq ID no.2 1-178:1-180) * * sequences ID no1 and no.2; page 5 - page 7 *; | [PDA]WO9932632 (MILLENNIUM BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [PDA] 5,13,14,17,20,24-26,28,30,32,34,36,39,40,43,44,48,50,52,54,56,58,59,61-63,65,67,69,71 * 99% identity in 702 nt overlap with seq ID no.1 (14-708:17-718) *;; figure 1A * | [A] - M.D. ADAMS ET AL, "Use of human BAC end sequences for sequence-ready map building", EMBL, (19980930), XP002143978 [A] 10,11 * abstract * | [ ] - UNPUBLISHED | [DA] - A.F. STRUYK ET AL, "Cloning of neurotrimin defines a new subfamily of differentially expressed neural cell adhesion molecules", EMBL, (19950419), XP002152432 [DA] 5,13,14,17,20 * abstract * | [ ] - THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (199503), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 2141 - 2156, XP000953464 | [A] - H. SEHRA ET AL, "Human DNA sequence from clone 718J7 on chromosome 20q13.31-13.33. contains part of a gene for a novel protein , the PCK1 gene for soluble phosphoenolpyruvate carboxykinase 1", EMBL, (19990224), XP002152433 [A] 5,13,14,17,20 * abstract * | [A] - L.HILLIER ET AL, "zl881e02.r1 Stratagene colon (#937204) Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:511034 5', mRNA sequence", EMBL, (19961030), XP002152434 [A] 5,13,14,17,20 * abstract * | [ ] - P. WOHLDMANN ET AL, "generation and analysis of 280,000 human expressed sequence tags", GENOME RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 6, no. 9, pages 807 - 828, XP000914615 | [AD] - J.I. JONSSON, "Mus musculus mRNA for myeloid associated differentiation protein", EMBL, (19971001), XP002152435 [AD] 5,13,14,17,20 * abstract * | [ ] - M. PETTERSSON ET AL, "Isolation of MYADM, a novel hematopoietic-associated marker gene expressed in multipotent progenitor cells and up-regulated during myeloid differentiation", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 67, pages 423 - 431 | [PDA] - O. OHARA ET AL, "Homos sapiens mRNA for KIAA1061 protein, partial cds", EMBL, (19990804), XP002152436 [PDA] 1-20 * abstract * * Q9UPU1: 100% identity in 693 aa overlap with seq ID no.16(150-842:1-693) * * 100% identity in 895 nt overlap with seq ID no.13 (221-1115:1-895) * * 100% identity in 4719 nt overlap with seq ID no.17 (784-5502:1-4719) * * 100% identity in 4719 nt overlap with seq ID no.15 (853-5571:1-4719) * * 100% identity in 693 aa overlap with seq ID no.18 (123-815:1-693) * * 100% identity in 298 aa overlap with seq ID no.14 (9-306:1-298) * | [ ] - R. KIKUNO ET AL, "Prediction of the coding sequences of unidentified human genes.XIV. The complete sequence of 100 new cDNA clones from brain which code for large proteins in vitro", DNA RESEARCH, (1999), vol. 6, pages 197 - 205, XP000852618 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/dnares/6.3.197 | [PA] - R.H. WATERSTON, "The sequence of Homo sapiens clone", EMBL, (20000111), XP002152437 [PA] 6,10-12,15,16,18,19 * abstract * |