EP1174005 - VARIABLE-EFFECT LIGHTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharos Innovations Inc. 258 Salem Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6H 3C7 / CA | [2002/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUXTON, James 258 Salem Avenue Toronto, Ontario M6H 3C7 / CA | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord St Nicholas Chambers Amen Corner Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 1PE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00922351.2 | 25.04.2000 | [2002/04] | WO2000CA00431 | Priority number, date | US19990295367 | 21.04.1999 Original published format: US 295367 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0182654 | Date: | 01.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174005 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, H05B37/02 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
H05B45/30 (EP,US);
H05B45/31 (EP,US);
H05B45/37 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/04] | Extension states | AL | 20.11.2001 | LT | 20.11.2001 | LV | 20.11.2001 | MK | 20.11.2001 | RO | 20.11.2001 | SI | 20.11.2001 | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT VARIABLEN LICHTEFFEKTEN | [2002/04] | English: | VARIABLE-EFFECT LIGHTING SYSTEM | [2002/04] | French: | SYST ME D'ILLUMINATION EFFETS VARIABLES | [2002/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/20] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5420482 (PHARES LOUIS A [CA]) [XD] 1,2,10,17,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 14 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 3 *; | [X]US4870325 (KAZAR DENNIS [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,11-13,19-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - line 10 * * column 3, line 20 - line 29 * * column 7, line 26 - line 35 * * column 8, line 34 - line 36 * * column 9, line 25 - line 29 * * claim - *; | [X]WO8203489 (GENERALIMPEX MAGYAR KULKERESKE [HU], et al) [X] 1,24,28 * abstract * * claims 1-3,6-9,11 *; | [A]GB2244358 (GOMOLUCH MARK STEPHEN) |