EP1116800 - SPUTTERING TARGET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Mining & Metals Co., Ltd. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/38] |
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states Nikko Materials Co., Ltd. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8407 / JP | ||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Nikko Materials Company, Limited 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8407 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAHARA, Yoshikazu, Isohara Fact. Nikko Materials Comp., Ltd, 4, 187-banchi, Usuba, Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1535 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZUKA, Keiichi, Isohara Fact. Nikko Materials Comp., Ltd, 4, 187-banchi, Usuba, Hanakawa-cho Kitaibaraki-shi, Ibaraki-ken 319-1535 / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Meddle, Alan Leonard FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00922926.1 | 01.05.2000 | [2001/29] | WO2000JP02865 | Priority number, date | JP19990201360 | 15.07.1999 Original published format: JP 20136099 | [2001/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106029 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116800 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116800 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.01.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/34 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
C23C14/3407 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2004/20] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SPUTTERTARGET | [2001/29] | English: | SPUTTERING TARGET | [2001/29] | French: | CIBLE DE PULVERISATION | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2001 | Translation filed | 23.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 27.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10182151 ; | [PX]US5997704 (SHIONO ICHIROU [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,7 * column 2, lines 48-59 *; | [X]JPH10310471 ; | [Y]US4662124 (KATO ICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [E]JP2001131737 ; | [A]JPS59197568 ; | [A]JPS61291964 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10182151 A 19980707 (MORO SATORU ET AL) [X] 1,4,5,7 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,6 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10310471 A 19981124 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP9287072 A 19971104 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP) [Y] 6 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001131737 A 20010515 (NIKKO MATERIALS CO LTD) [E] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850326), vol. 0090, no. 66, Database accession no. (C - 271), & JP59197568 A 19841109 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870526), vol. 0111, no. 63, Database accession no. (C - 424), & JP61291964 A 19861222 (ANELVA CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]US4662124 (KATO ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH10298743 (TOSOH CORP); | [A] - FUKUI,T. ET AL, "Warpage of InP wafers.", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS, (1997), vol. 9, pages 272 - 275, XP000801135 |