EP1101775 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RUBBER LATEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Mitsumasa 48-10, Ankouji-cho 5-chome Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1029 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Masakuni 2-63, Okihamamachi, Takasago-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0026 / JP | 03 /
NODA, Mitsunaga 172-3-202, Minamibingo, Kakogawa-cho Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 675-0033 / JP | 04 /
MITANI, Toragorou 829-4, Sone-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-0082 / JP | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00922947.7 | 02.05.2000 | [2001/21] | WO2000JP02890 | Priority number, date | JP19990127814 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12781499 | [2001/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068283 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101775 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F36/04, C08F2/22, C08F2/44 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
C08F36/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F36/04, C08F2/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/21] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KAUTSCHUKLATEX | [2001/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING RUBBER LATEX | [2001/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LATEX DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2000 | Translation filed | 03.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2001 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 23.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 18.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AU452524B (NIPPON OIL) [X] 1-4 * claim - * * page 6, line 9 - line 14 *; | [X]US2546244 (TUCKER CHARLES M) [X] 1-4 * examples I,III *; | [X] - Y. ARAKI, "synthesis of a polydispersed polybutadiene latex....", POLYMER JOURNAL., SOCIETY OF POLYMER SCIENCE. TOKYO., JP, (1987), vol. 19, no. 7, ISSN 0032-3896, pages 863 - 871, XP002228343 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * page 865, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/polymj.19.863 | International search | [X]EP0722961 ; | [A]JPS6348313 ; | [A]JPS5071790 |