EP1094397 - MEETING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMAKURA, Hiroshi Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa3-ch ome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
NAGASAKA, Fumio Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 00922951.9 | 01.05.2000 | [2001/17] | WO2000JP02895 | Priority number, date | JP19990126856 | 07.05.1999 Original published format: JP 12685699 | [2001/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0068807 | Date: | 16.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094397 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, H04N7/15 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
H04L12/40117 (EP);
G06Q50/00 (KR);
G06Q10/109 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/17] | G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERSAMMLUNGSSYSTEM UND INFORMATIONSBEWAHRMEDIUM | [2001/17] | English: | MEETING SYSTEM AND INFORMATION STORAGE MEDIUM | [2001/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE REUNION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE D'INFORMATIONS | [2001/17] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2001 | Translation filed | 02.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5572728 (TADA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6,13-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO9906910 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4,7-9,11,12,16,17 * abstract * * page 4, line 7 - line 27 * * page 8, line 19 - line 31 * * claims 1,3,5,7,13,17,23,24,26,30,35-37,46,48,49 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]GB2324175 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * page 5, line 39 - page 6, line 10 * * page 9, line 1 - line 8 * * page 9, line 24 - line 30 * * page 11, line 4 - line 11 * * claims 1,7,9,10 * | [PX] - GUTTMAN E ET AL, "Automatic discovery of thin servers: SLP, Jini and the SLP-Jini Bridge", INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, 1999. IECON '99 PROCEEDINGS. THE 25TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE SAN JOSE, CA, USA 29 NOV.-3 DEC. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991129), ISBN 0-7803-5735-3, pages 722 - 727, XP010366641 [PX] 1-4,7-12,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IECON.1999.816490 | [X] - SUN MICROSYSTEMS, "Jini Technology and Emerging Network Technologies", SUN MICROSYSTEMS, (19990118), XP002141075 [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,16,17 * the whole document * | [XY] - "SUN MICROSYSTEMS Jini(TM) Architectural Overview", SUN MICROSYSTEMS ICG WHITE PAPER, XX, XX, (199901), pages 1 - 27, XP002266391 [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,16 * paragraph [0002] * [Y] 10 | [Y] - KEVIN L MILLS, "AirJava: Networking for Smart Spaces", INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY LABORATORY - NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, (19990329), XP002200580 [Y] 10 * paragraphs [03.2] , [04.3] * | [A] - SUN MICROSYSTEMS, "Jini (TM) Device Architecture Specification", SUN MICROSYSTEMS, (19990125), XP002153332 [A] 1-4,7-9,11,12,16 * paragraph [0002] * | International search | [Y]JPH07181935 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH0437922 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10285235 (SONY CORP) | [X] - TAKUHIRO KIMURA ET AL., "Seminar keishiki no kyodo gakushu wo shien suru system no sekkei", SEARCH REPORT OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN (IPSJ), (19971219), vol. 97, no. 125, pages 39 - 46, XP002946662 | [A] - YUKO IKEHATA ET AL., "Java wo mochiita WWW page jo deno iyudo no takai togogata kyodo sagyo shien system: Universal canvas", SEARCH REPORT OF INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN (IPSJ), (19970306), vol. 97, no. 23, pages 43 - 48, XP002946663 |