EP1304719 - PHOTOMULTIPLIER TUBE, PHOTOMULTIPLIER TUBE UNIT, AND RADIATION DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K. 1126-1 Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMOI, Hideki Hamamatsu Photonics K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
ATSUMI, Akira Hamamatsu Photonics K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
KYUSHIMA, Hiroyuki Hamamatsu Photonics K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Smith, Samuel Leonard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/03] | Smith, Samuel Leonard, et al J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [2005/45] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00922980.8 | 08.05.2000 | [2003/17] | WO2000JP02927 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0186690 | Date: | 15.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1304719 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.11.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/28 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
H01J43/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOVERVIELFACHERRÖHRE, PHOTOVERVIELFACHERRÖHRENEINHEIT UND STRAHLUNGSDETEKTOR | [2003/17] | English: | PHOTOMULTIPLIER TUBE, PHOTOMULTIPLIER TUBE UNIT, AND RADIATION DETECTOR | [2003/17] | French: | TUBE PHOTOMULTIPLICATEUR, UNITE DE TUBE PHOTOMULTIPLICATEUR ET DETECTEUR DE RAYONNEMENT | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2002 | Translation filed | 28.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0565247 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [AD]JPH05290793 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]EP0589671 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 10,14* claims 1,12 *; | [L]EP1304720 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [L] 1,10,14 * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 19; claims 1,12 *; | [L]EP1304718 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [L] 1 * column 10, line 44 - column 11, line 32; figures 13-15; claims 1-13 * | International search | [XE]JP2000149861 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]JPH11345587 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK); | [A]US5864207 (KUME HIDEHIRO [JP], et al) | Examination | US3951698 | US4568567 | EP0587313 | by applicant | EP0565247 |