|
10.10.2007 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
01.07.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2002 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.11.2002 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.10.2000 |
Urgent incoming letter |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |