07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
12.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
12.10.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
29.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
22.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
18.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
03.11.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
20.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.09.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.02.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
28.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.05.2003 |
First examination report |
|
20.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
15.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
04.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.03.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
17.03.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] |
06.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|