EP1175771 - TEXT INPUT BY SELECTING INFORMATION ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLZ AUF DER HEIDE, Bernd Pennstr. 67 D-81549 München / DE | 02 /
OBERMAIER, Anton Helene-Weber-Allee 13 D-80637 München / DE | [2002/05] | Application number, filing date | 00925173.7 | 05.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000EP03044 | Priority number, date | EP19990108781 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: EP 99108781 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067454 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175771 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175771 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M1/247, H04Q7/22, G06F3/033 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
H04M1/7243 (EP);
H04M1/72469 (EP);
H04M2250/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/25] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | TEXTEINGABE DURCH SELEKTION VON INFORMATIONSEINHEITEN | [2002/05] | English: | TEXT INPUT BY SELECTING INFORMATION ELEMENTS | [2002/05] | French: | SAISIE DE TEXTE PAR SELECTION D'UNITES D'INFORMATION | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0693860 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0751627 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 44; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0755126 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 2 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0801512 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 21 - column 6, line 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19624679 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]EP0837433 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0860971 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9854846 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 9, line 20 - page 12, line 12; figures 1,2 * * page 12, line 31 - page 13, line 2 * * page 15, line 25 - page 19, line 12; figures 1-3 * |