EP1185459 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH WRAPPING OF A PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pesmel OY Jussilantie 2 61800 Kauhajoki / FI | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANNILA, Pasi Taunontie 2 F 16 FIN-61800 Kauhajoki / FI | 02 /
ISOMÄKI, Matti-Pekka Kuismintie 7 FIN-60760 Pojanluoma / FI | 03 /
LEHTINEVA, Juha Puistopolku 10 B 20 FIN-60100 Seinäjoki / FI | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka, et al Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 6 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 00925338.6 | 12.05.2000 | [2002/11] | WO2000FI00425 | Priority number, date | FI19990001327 | 10.06.1999 Original published format: FI 991327 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0076852 | Date: | 21.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1185459 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1185459 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1185459 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/02 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B65H19/126 (EP,US);
B65B11/00 (EP,US);
B65B11/04 (EP,US);
B65H16/02 (EP,US);
B65B2210/20 (EP,US);
B65H2301/3251 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/46] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI | Extension states | AL | 23.11.2001 | LT | 23.11.2001 | LV | 23.11.2001 | MK | 23.11.2001 | RO | 23.11.2001 | SI | 23.11.2001 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN BEZUG AUF DAS UMHÜLLEN EINES GEGENSTANDES | [2002/11] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH WRAPPING OF A PIECE | [2002/11] | French: | PROCEDE ET ARRANGEMENT EN RELATION AVEC L'EMBALLAGE D'UN OBJET | [2002/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.08.2004 | FI | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | LU | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/47] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LU | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
FI | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 11.08.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 11.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05221409 ; | [A]EP0220712 (PIERI SRL [IT]); | [A]US4914891 (SUOLAHTI YRJOE [FI]); | [A]DE19601668 (SCHEICH DIETER [DE]); | [A]US5797240 (MARTIN-COCHER JEAN-PAUL [FR], et al); | [AP]WO0016607 (WELMOUNT LIMITED [IE], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP05221409 A 19930831 (FUJI SEISAKUSHO:KK) |