EP1175622 - FIXED MULTIFUNCTION SENSOR FOR AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES AVIONICS S.A. Aérodrome de Villacoublay 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [2005/11] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states THALES AVIONICS S.A. Aérodrome de Villacoublay 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOISNET, Joel, Thomson-CSF Prop. Int., Dépt. Brevets, 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Guérin, Michel Marks & Clerk France 31-33 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/05] | Guérin, Michel THALES Intellectual Property, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 00925358.4 | 28.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000FR01162 | Priority number, date | FR19990005545 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: FR 9905545 | [2002/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0067039 | Date: | 09.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175622 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175622 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01P13/02, G01P5/14 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G01P13/025 (EP,US);
G01P5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FESTE MULTIFUNKTIONSSONDE FÜR LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2002/05] | English: | FIXED MULTIFUNCTION SENSOR FOR AIRCRAFT | [2002/05] | French: | SONDE MULTIFONCTIONS FIXE POUR AERONEF | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1300142 (SUD AVIATION) [A] 1 * page 2, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US3079758 (VOGEL ALVIN R, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 33; figure 1 *; | [DA]US4096744 (DE LEO RICHARD V, et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5628565 (HAGEN FLOYD W [US], et al); | [A]DE19640606 (NORD MICRO ELEKTRONIK FEINMECH [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 9 - line 26 * * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 25; figures 1,2 * |