EP1175527 - PROCESS FOR COATING A PERFORATED SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states First Water Limited Hilldrop Lane, Ramsbury Marlborough Wiltshire SN8 2RB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states First Water Limited Hilldrop Lane, Ramsbury Marlborough, Wiltshire SN8 2RB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNRO, Hugh, Semple Barton Cottage, Weston Sub Edge Chipping Camden, Warwickshire GL55 6QT / GB | 02 /
LAWRENCE, Steven, John 67 Keresley Road Coventry CV6 2JB / GB | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00925448.3 | 13.04.2000 | [2002/05] | WO2000GB01415 | Priority number, date | GB19990009349 | 23.04.1999 Original published format: GB 9909349 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0065143 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1175527 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175527 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/00, D06N7/00, A61L15/00, A61F13/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
A61L15/425 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M15/285 (EP,US);
D06M15/3566 (EP,US);
D06M23/00 (EP,US);
D06N3/0097 (EP,US);
D06N3/045 (EP,US);
D06N3/047 (EP,US);
D06N3/125 (EP,US);
D06N3/128 (EP,US);
D06N2211/18 (EP,US);
D06N2213/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON PERFORIERTEN SUBSTRATEN | [2002/05] | English: | PROCESS FOR COATING A PERFORATED SUBSTRATE | [2002/05] | French: | PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT PERFORE | [2002/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.08.2003 | BE | 13.08.2003 | CH | 13.08.2003 | CY | 13.08.2003 | FI | 13.08.2003 | LI | 13.08.2003 | NL | 13.08.2003 | DK | 13.11.2003 | GR | 13.11.2003 | SE | 13.11.2003 | ES | 24.11.2003 | PT | 13.01.2004 | IE | 13.04.2004 | LU | 13.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
IE | 13.04.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
LU | 13.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
ES | 24.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
PT | 13.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
DK | 13.11.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
BE | 13.08.2003 | ||
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
CH | 13.08.2003 | ||
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
LI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
SE | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 13.08.2003 | |
FI | 13.08.2003 | ||
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
GR | 13.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 13.08.2003 | |
NL | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 13.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4661099 (VON BITTERA MIKLOS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10,15 * abstract * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 32 *; | [XA]US4838253 (BRASSINGTON NIGEL J [GB], et al) [X] 16-18,20 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 28; claim - * [A] 1-15; | [X]US4921704 (FABO TOMAS [SE]) [X] 16,18,20 * column 2, line 28 - line 59; figure -; claim - *; | [XY]WO9319709 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [X] 16-18,20 * claim - * [Y] 1-15; | [DXY]US5352508 (CHEONG CATHERINE L [GB]) [DX] 16-20 * column 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; example -; claim - * * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 65 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]EP0676457 (GRAPHIC CONTROLS CORP [US]) [Y] 11-14* claim - *; | [Y]WO9742985 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-10,15 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 16; figure -; claim - * * page 9 *; | [PXA]FR2783412 (LHD LAB HYGIENE DIETETIQUE [FR]) [PX] 16,17,19,20 * example 1; claim - * [PA] 1-15 |